ADAM'S ROSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adam's Rose provides support to those suffering from grief through various different channels including postal, online, social media support groups, community events and outings and also partnerships with local hospitals, funeral homes and other services. Currently supporting those in Cambridgeshire, we hope to expand the geographical regions we cover.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Hurst | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hurst Mrs | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margo Leftly | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Steven Leftly | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.48k | £5.43k | £4.47k | £24.40k | £8.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.01k | £930 | £4.24k | £14.83k | £17.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING BEREAVEMENT BY PROVIDING SUPPORT THROUGH LITERATURE, QUARTERLY EVENTS AND AN ONLINE MEMBERS FORUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 RYDAL CLOSE
HUNTINGDON
PE29 6UF
- Phone:
- 07867335299
- Email:
- INFO@ADAMSROSE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window