GUJARAT SAMAJ NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide services which otherwise are not provided by other organisation/agencies in form of cultural and social activities. We promote cultural activities, sports, education, elderly luncheon club & recreational activities. We work with people who are under represented within the main stream to bring awareness and confidence by providing and promoting different events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 08 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kumar Seth | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirit Dabhi | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DILIP DESAI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.46k | £15.63k | £9.44k | £20.10k | £17.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.09k | £6.64k | £7.10k | £11.11k | £13.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1983
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HINDUISM PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE PROVISION OF: A) A PLACE OR WORSHIP B) A CULTURAL ADVICE AND EDUCATION CENTRE C) A YOUTH SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
HANDEL STREET COMMUNITY CENTRE
28 HANDEL STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 1JE
- Phone:
- 07888756738
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window