ACADEMY FOR ANAESTHESIA EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational activities: Conduct courses, teaching and training medical professionals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Madan Narayanan MD FRCA | Chair | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arun Venkataraju MD FRCA | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr IRFAN RAZA | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Govindarajan Sridhar MBBS FRCA | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.94k | £9.27k | £20.34k | £38.68k | £43.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £4.15k | £16.60k | £39.82k | £34.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF DOCTORS WHO SPECIALISE IN THE FIELD OF ANAESTHESIA AND INTENSIVE CARE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRIOR END
CAMBERLEY
GU15 1JW
- Phone:
- 01276501447
- Email:
- info@nerveblock.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window