HONITON U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SELF-HELP ORGANISATION FOR RETIRED AND SEMI-RETIRED PEOPLE WHO COME TOGETHER TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND CREATIVE INTERESTS IN A FRIENDLY AND INFORMAL ENVIRONMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 05 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Spoerry | Chair | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Stuart Gill | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Honor Edwina Head | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Whitehead | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzie Blithe | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Boyd | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Brian James Churchill | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Moran | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Crawshaw-Gander | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Mary aka Kay Edge | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Halse | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Long | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.53k | £2.91k | £3.82k | £5.22k | £5.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.99k | £3.13k | £4.13k | £5.85k | £7.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAR 2018 as amended on 24 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eddystone
Langford Road
HONITON
Devon
EX14 1QA
- Phone:
- 07834656204
- Email:
- peter@halse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window