PLYMOUTH ARGYLE HERITAGE ARCHIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to preserve and make available items of memorabilia and other artefacts connected to the history of Plymouth Argyle through collection, storage, exhibition and displays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 26 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John David Eales BSc | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Richard Thomas Ellacott | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christian Alexander Kent | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wright | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.62k | £3.23k | £6.20k | £3.85k | £2.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £4.30k | £3.65k | £3.52k | £3.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
1.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF THE HISTORY, HERITAGE, AND SOCIAL IMPACT OF PLYMOUTH ARGYLE FOOTBALL CLUB (THE "CLUB") AND ITS ANTECEDENTS, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: 1.1.1 THE ACQUISITION, PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND DISPLAY (EITHER DIRECTLY OR IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHERS) OR MEMORABILIA, (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROGRAMMES, MEDALS, CLOTHING AND PHOTOGRAPHS) AND OTHER ARTEFACTS LINKED TO THE CLUB AS THE DIRECTORS DEEM FIT; AND 1.1.2 BY RESEARCHING, COLLECTING, COLLATING AND ARCHIVING OF FACT. DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIALS (IN WHICHEVER MEDIUM) OR EDUCATIONAL, ARTISTIC, AND/OR HISTORIC VALUE OF SIGNIFICANCE AND PERUSAL PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plymouth Argyle Football Co Ltd
Home Park
PLYMOUTH
PL2 3DQ
- Phone:
- 07919367695
- Email:
- contact@argylearchive.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window