ALL SAINTS, BELGRAVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate in the All Saints Church, Belgrave at Kerrysdale Avenue, Leicester, LE4 7GH. We offer free coaching and music classes. We organise free coffee mornings and offer a warm and welcome space to one and all. We also run a food pantry where we address the issue of food poverty and a warm bank for people suffering from fuel poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
Governance
- 12 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sunny George | Chair | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zoobia Javed | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamlesh Prasad | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Siddhartha George | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pawan George | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Risfa Zumard | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Shamaoun | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen May White | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pawan Sunny George | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony James Lees - Smith | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarfraz Tabassum Masih | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nargis Masih | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anja Peter | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sania Sam | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amitkumar Kiritbhai Rajul | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rupahli Ilyas | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jagdeep Kaur Hunjan | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.93k | £19.10k | £19.86k | £32.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.55k | £14.71k | £26.92k | £25.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2023 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2023 | 350 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2022 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2023 | 715 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE: 4.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MISSION, VALUES AND TENETS OF FAITH OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; AND 4.2. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY PRIMARILY IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE CITY OF LEICESTER BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO: 4.2.1. INDIVIDUALS IN NEED; AND 4.2.2. TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church Belgrave
20 KERRYSDALE AVENUE
LEICESTER
LE4 7GH
- Phone:
- 01162127562
- Email:
- jesus4sungeo@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window