SOUTH EAST ESSEX RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 04 April 2019: CIO registration
- SOUTH EAST ESSEX RDA (Working name)
- SOUTH EAST ESSEX RIDING FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Denmead | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kerry Norcross | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Beverley Jean Dove | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jacqueline Brown | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 825 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1190 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1555 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL- BEING IN THE ESSEX AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARLEYLANDS EQUESTRIAN CENTRE
WHITES FARM
BARLEYLANDS ROAD
BASILDON
SS15 4BG
- Phone:
- 07568313922
- Email:
- southeastessexrda@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window