THE WEST WALES GRAND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) TO RECEIVE DONATIONS FROM MASONS AND MASONIC BODIES b) TO MAKE CHARITABLE DONATIONS TO OTHER OBJECTS BOTH MASONIC AND NON MASONIC c) TO MAINTAIN PRUDENT AND ADEQUATE RESERVES d) TO ADMINISTER THE "DAVID AND ELONWY EVANS MASONIC TRUST FUND" IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS AGREED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 23 September 1983: Standard registration
- THE SOUTH WALES (WESTERN DIVISION) GRAND CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alun Littlejohns | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Charles Trumper | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Alfred Thurgood | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|||||
James Ross | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL VINCENT ECKLEY | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RYLAND LEWIS JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.38k | £157.37k | £155.55k | £194.35k | £205.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.07k | £382.41k | £145.61k | £158.73k | £161.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19 AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED 18 AUGUST 1983 AND 18 NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO RECEIVE DONATIONS OF MONEY FROM INDIVIDUAL MASONS, LODGES, CHAPTERS AND/OR OTHER MASONIC BODIES, AND TO DISTRIBUTE SUCH SUMS TO OTHER CHARITIES OR CAUSES, MASONIC OR OTHERWISE, AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Manor Way
Llanllwch
CARMARTHEN
Dyfed
SA31 3RL
- Phone:
- 01267 243402
- Email:
- SEC@WWMASON.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window