HEART LINK (EAST MIDLANDS CHILDREN'S HEART CARE ASSOCIATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity continues to be to provide relief for children suffering from heart disease and allied conditions by the provision of facilities with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 10 August 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Barnes | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Margaret Dilkes | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard French | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARIE ANN CHASTON | Trustee | 31 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Vincent Matts | Trustee | 05 May 2013 |
|
|||||
EMMA BOWSKILL | Trustee | 31 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS JA BURGESS | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS JENNIE MCGURK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF SMART MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN DILKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE RIGBY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.39k | £142.34k | £122.97k | £231.00k | £188.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.43k | £214.43k | £65.41k | £132.47k | £270.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 3 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM HEART DISEASE AND ALLIED CONDITIONS AND THOSE UNDER THE CARE OF THE UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS OF LEICESTER CARDIO-RESPIRATORY DIRECTORATE AND/OR THOSE RECEIVING E.C.M.O (EXTRA CORPOREAL MEMBRANE OXYGENATION TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 ROCKHILL DRIVE
MOUNTSORREL
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 7DT
- Phone:
- 01162106875
- Email:
- gsmart10@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window