DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Members form interest groups covering as wide a range of topics and activities as they desire; by the members, for the members. No qualifications are sought or offered. Learning is for its own sake, with enjoyment being the prime motive. There is no distinction between the learners and the teachers; they are all U3A members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 May 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoff Dent | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Douglas | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Mary Townend | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Joan Mills | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lydia Smith | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Joy Cooper | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Marie Wood | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Philpott | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Tomalin | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Patricia Hargreaves | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.37k | £5.48k | £540 | £10.88k | £9.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.99k | £3.94k | £7.03k | £9.68k | £9.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JUN 2018 as amended on 19 Jul 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 TADCASTER CLOSE
DAVENTRY
NN11 0GB
- Phone:
- 01327311377
- Email:
- janice.hargreaves@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window