Amyloidosis UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) providing information, support and advice to people living with the Condition, their families and carers; b) advocating to ensure that every person has timely and effective diagnosis, treatment and care of the Condition; c) working closely with all stakeholders to facilitate the availability of effective treatments for the Condition. d) funding and supporting research to advance scientif
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 May 2019: CIO registration
- UK ATTR AMYLOIDOSIS PATIENTS' ASSOCIATION (UKATPA) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Robert Macleod | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Pozzo | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Gregory | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Eleanor Bramwell | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARLOS HERAS-PALOU | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Vincent Graham Nesan Nicholas | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.57k | £31.26k | £33.00k | £3.70k | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.00k | £9.63k | £31.00k | £16.43k | £18.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 May 2019 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM LIVING WITH THE MEDICAL CONDITION ATTR AMYLOIDOSIS (KNOWN AS THE ‘CONDITION’) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO PEOPLE LIVING WITH THE CONDITION, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; B) ADVOCATING TO ENSURE THAT EVERY PERSON HAS TIMELY AND EFFECTIVE DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND CARE OF THE CONDITION; C) WORKING CLOSELY WITH ALL STAKEHOLDERS TO FACILITATE THE AVAILABILITY OF EFFECTIVE TREATMENTS FOR THE CONDITION. D) FUNDING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH TO ADVANCE SCIENTIFIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE CONDITION AND ITS EFFECTIVE TREATMENT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HACKAMOR HOUSE
GROVE LANE
REDLYNCH
SALISBURY
SP5 2NR
- Phone:
- 01725238166
- Email:
- vince@ttramyloidosis.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window