THE LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE ELSTREE

Charity number: 1182920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The synagogue promotes Liberal Judaism, for the benefit of the public good. It does so by providing a place of worship; conducting religious ceremonies; raising awareness of religious beliefs and practices; providing pastoral care and outreach; promoting interfaith activities; and educating people about and generally advancing the religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £277,115
Total expenditure: £278,990

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Brent
  • Enfield
  • Harrow
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 April 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • TLSE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leigh Renak Chair 18 August 2022
THE LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE ELSTREE
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Jonathan Holman Trustee 18 August 2022
None on record
Anne Jacqueline Ellis Shavick Trustee 18 August 2022
None on record
Richard Daniel Elman Trustee 18 August 2022
None on record
Harry Max Hurst Trustee 18 August 2022
None on record
MICHAEL MORRIS REBAK Trustee 18 August 2022
None on record
Estelle Jeanette Leigh Trustee 18 August 2022
None on record
Terry Benson Trustee 18 August 2022
None on record
Michael Geoffrey Beral Trustee 09 June 2019
RADLETT, ELSTREE, BOREHAMWOOD AND SHENLEY TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED
Received: On time
EMPLOYMENT RESOURCE CENTRE
Received: On time
THE LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE ELSTREE
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
REMAP 2010
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £317.90k £341.53k £246.05k £277.12k
Total expenditure £0 £289.71k £363.78k £243.03k £278.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.28k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 December 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 December 2022 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Liberal Synagogue Elstree
Old School
High Street
Elstree
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 3EY
Phone:
02089538889