MASJID ABU BAKR WALTHAMSTOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MASJID ABU BAKR IS PLACE OF WORSHIP, IT OFFERS FAMILY EDUCATIONAL CLASSES, MARRIAGE SERVICES AND BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING AND LEGAL ADVICE. THE MASJID STANDS AS A PILLAR WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AND HELPS CONNECT DIVERSE GROUPS OF PEOPLE AND IS AN ACTIVE PARTICIPANT WITHIN ALL FAITH COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 August 2020: CIO registration
- 17 January 2025: Funds received from 1145777 MASJID ABU BAKR
- MASJID ABU BAKR (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Asim Razaq | Chair | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Imran Majid | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohsin Sheikh | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sayed Jamaal Rashid | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHSIN VAID | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Rehman | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kamran Anwar | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £407.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £279.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN WALTHAMSTOW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF THE SUNNI HANAFI DEOBANDI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A MASJID AND THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26A MANSFIELD ROAD
LONDON
E17 6PJ
- Phone:
- 02036596553
- Email:
- info@masjidabubakr.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window