THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD THIS LATTER HOUSE, CORBY

Charity Number: 1182699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £46,609
Total expenditure: £18,900

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ajibola Ativie Trustee 17 August 2023
None on record
Oluwatimilehin John Trustee 03 December 2021
None on record
Femi Fajemilo Trustee 03 December 2021
None on record
Abayomi Olatunji Trustee 28 October 2018
None on record
Ezekiel Afon Trustee 28 October 2018
None on record
Ayodele Adeeyo Trustee 28 October 2018
THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD KINGDOM AMBASSADORS BOLSOVER
Received: On time
THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD SALVATION HOUSE DIDCOT
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.52k £16.00k £21.07k £30.40k £46.61k
Total expenditure £12.72k £15.43k £16.82k £16.86k £18.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
72 Newmarket Close
CORBY
NN18 8QH
Phone:
07944296685