CARING FOR HUMANITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial aid and relief to the needy and poor people in Bangladesh and the homeless in the UK. The financial aid could be used for Education Purpose, Sanitation, Medical facilities, Water facilities, Shelters, Clothing & Foods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 06 December 2019: CIO registration
- HANDS OF HUMANITY CIC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEIKH NAJMIN BEGUM | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anhar Khan | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £2.56k | £3.44k | £6.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £650 | £1.27k | £2.32k | £7.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BANGLADESH BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARING FOR HUMANITY
Ebenezer House
1st Floor
Room - 2
2-10 St. Johns Street
BEDFORD
- Phone:
- 02033436354
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window