POVERTY TRUTH NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Poverty Truth Network supports local groups to establish new Poverty Truth Commissions across the UK; nurtures the work of local commissions; provides a strategic national response to factors that contribute to poverty that consistently emerge from the local commissions; and engages with a wider movement of organisations and programmes that seek to alleviate poverty in all its forms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 2019: CIO registration
- PTN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Brown | Chair | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Dean | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA MARY YOUNG | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Michelle Burckett St Laurent | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kidist Teklemariam | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Atkinson | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Stuart Hemsworth | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Douglas | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.29k | £81.28k | £96.03k | £309.80k | £313.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.20k | £68.89k | £88.65k | £165.99k | £261.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Aug 2019 as amended on 05 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO, UNDERSTANDING THE FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE, EDUCATING THE PUBLIC REGARDING THESE FACTORS AND DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING PROGRAMS THAT ENABLE OTHERS, ESPECIALLY THOSE WITH A LIVED EXPERIENCE OF POVERTY, TO TAKE ACTION TO MITIGATE THESE FACTORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Carter Terrace
Leeds
LS15 7AH
- Phone:
- 07783934581
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window