POTTER'S HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UK PORTSMOUTH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Object: "The Charitable Objects Of The Church Are: A) To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement Of Beliefs in Portsmouth, other parts of the United Kingdom and the world. B) The relief of poverty and sickness and to relieve the distress caused thereby regardless of nationality, religious political or other opinion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 23 April 2019: CIO registration
- 06 November 2020: Funds received from 1163060 POTTER'S HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UK PORTSMOUTH ...
- POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CHURCH (Working name)
- POTTERS HOUSE PORTSMOUTH (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kane Nichols | Chair | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Claxton | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | £12.50k | £9.35k | £13.60k | £17.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.80k | £12.22k | £9.87k | £13.75k | £18.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 4.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 4.3 SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANDPORT COMMUNITY CENTRE
CHARLES STREET
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 1JD
- Phone:
- 07724715324
- Email:
- sam9holt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window