WHEELS 2 WORK UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of grants and services to other organisations working to provide affordable transport (usually in the form of powered two wheelers), to help those unable to use public or private transport to access employment, training or further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 April 2020: Standard registration
- W2W UK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Thomas Dotchin | Chair | 17 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Karl Andrew Pahnke | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Young | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian Jowett | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fred Stevens | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Campbell | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dale Rodney Curtis | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.52k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.42k | £6.07k | £2.25k | £2.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
‘THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THOSE WHO ARE RESTRICTED DUE TO LACK OF PERSONAL TRANSPORT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ALTERNATIVE TRANSPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO ACCESS TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL COURSES THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO ACCESS. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SERVICES TO OTHER CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO HELP RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR ARE IN LOW PAID WORK AND WHO ARE RESTRICTED BY THE LACK OF PERSONAL TRANSPORT TO FACILITATE ACCESS TO AND THE USE OF WORK OPPORTUNITIES OR ALTERNATIVE WORK OPPORTUNITIES AND/OR TRAINING.’
Contact information
- Address:
-
W2W UK
c/o 1 Rye Hill Office Park
Birmingham Road
Allesley
Coventry
CV5 9AB
- Phone:
- 07786374115
- Email:
- info@wheels2workuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window