LYTHAM ST ANNES PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To teach and practice the art and science of photography.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 October 1983: Standard registration
- THE LYTHAM ST ANNES PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Williamson | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Barker | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William John Breckenridge | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Esther Parkinson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jennifer Wolstenholme | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andy Ogilvie | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Foreman | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Coulson | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Cahill | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Halstead | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Watson | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Watson | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.30k | £3.31k | £6.84k | £8.42k | £6.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.90k | £2.53k | £4.69k | £7.57k | £5.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 1979 AS AMENDED ON 06 JAN 1983 AS AMENDED ON 01 SEP 1983 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 1992 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 1993 AS AMENDED ON 02 JUL 2009 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2021 as amended on 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF PHOTOGRAPHY AS AN ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Well Community Hall
St Albans Rd
Lytham St Annes
FY8 1UZ
- Phone:
- 07599199932
- Email:
- info@lsaps.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window