LUTTERWORTH U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the U3A is the advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 25 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glenys Peverley | Chair | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Turner-Powell | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
peter Williamson | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Griffin | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elliott | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Blythe | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caren Simpson | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Tegg | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Patton | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Grindlay | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barrows | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
June Clayton | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.89k | £7.19k | £4.72k | £4.19k | £19.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.68k | £9.77k | £2.72k | £3.96k | £18.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAR 2018 as amended on 22 Jul 2021 as amended on 22 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE U3A IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Lammas Close
Ashby Parva
LUTTERWORTH
Leicestershire
LE17 5JF
- Phone:
- 07583201761
- Email:
- PETEINASHBYPARVA@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window