ROTHERHAM FOSTER CARER'S ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity holds termly events for our Fostering Families including parties, discos, weekly youth hub, fundraising and other events that may be raised with the committee. These events are run by RMBC Foster Carer's using local community resources i.e. local community centres.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,497 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 24 July 2019: Standard registration
- RFCA (Working name)
- ROTHERHAMFCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Goodman | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Frith | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.67k | £9.60k | £1.07k | £15.61k | £15.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.58k | £11.63k | £2.23k | £15.20k | £10.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.20k | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN IN ROTHERHAM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WORKING WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS AND OTHERS TO MAXIMISE THE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE FOSTERED TO THRIVE AND FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING: 2.0.1 TO SUPPORT, ENCOURAGE AND REPRESENT FOSTER CARERS 2.0.2 TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR DISCUSSION AND REPRESENT VIEWS TO SERVICE PROVIDERS 2.0.3 TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION AND ENJOYMENT FOR FOSTER CARERS, THEIR CHILDREN, THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE IN FOSTER CARE AND SERVICE PROVIDERS 2.0.4 TO CHAMPION THE RIGHTS OF ALL YOUNG PEOPLE BEING LOOKED AFTER AND WORK WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS AND OTHERS TO ENABLE THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE TO CONTRIBUTE TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE FOSTERING SERVICE AND TO ACHIEVE THEIR FULL ACADEMIC,PHYSICAL, SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS 2.0.5 TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE FOSTERING COMMUNITY 2.0.6 TO ENGAGE IN EDUCATIONAL AND PROMOTIONAL ACTIVITIES 2.0.7 TO SUPPORT THE RECRUITMENT OF NEW CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RFCA Care of Joanne Frith
Floor 1 Wing C Riverside House
Main Street
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S60 1AE
- Phone:
- 07415925665
- Email:
- vicechair@rotherhamfca.org
- Website:
-
WWW.ROTHERHAMFCA.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window