FREE THEATRE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education in, and appreciation of, the arts and in particular of drama, literature and musical theatre, in such ways as the trustees shall from time to time determine including through the staging of accessible theatre productions of artistic merit and related educational programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig AustIn | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.35k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 09 October 2024 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 09 October 2024 | 248 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 18 May 2023 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 277 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR OF DRAMA, LITERATURE AND MUSICAL THEATRE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE INCLUDING THROUGH THE STAGING OF ACCESSIBLE THEATRE PRODUCTIONS OF ARTISTIC MERIT AND RELATED EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Graig Park Parade
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP20 6GW
- Phone:
- 07530692916
- Email:
- dana.morris1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window