THE MAYOR OF MONMOUTH BOROUGH COUNCIL'S APPEAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 15 June 1983: Standard registration
- 20 March 2006: Removed (Ceased to be charitable)
- THE CHAIRMAN OF MONMOUTH DISTRICT COUNCIL'S APPEAL FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 MAY 1981
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE CHAIRMAN MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY WRITING APPOINT (BUT SO THAT ANY SUCH APPOINTMENT SHALL BE MADE NOT LATER THAN TWELVE MONTHS AFTER THE DATE OF RECEIPT OF THE MONIES TO WHICH THE APPOINTMENT RELATES) AND SUBJECT THERETO AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window