LITTLE HERO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Hero has the following key aims: To support other children and their families going through cancer treatment To fund research into new treatments and practical solutions for high risk pediatric brain tumours
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Rainsbury | Chair | 05 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Neil Lippiatt | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Steven Phillips | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.62k | £79.16k | £51.36k | £42.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.77k | £73.26k | £51.14k | £19.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CHILDHOOD BRAIN TUMOURS BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH PROJECTS THAT SEEK TO IMPROVE TREATMENT METHODS OF CHILDHOOD BRAIN TUMOURS AND THE CARE OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CHILDHOOD BRAIN TUMOURS AND TO PUBLISH ALL USEFUL RESULTS ARISING FROM SUCH RESEARCH; AND 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF CHILDREN LIVING IN THE UK SUFFERING FROM BRAIN TUMOURS AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES BY PROVIDING MONEY, SERVICES, ITEMS AND/OR FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURNBRIDGE COTTAGE
CADELEIGH
TIVERTON
EX16 8RY
- Phone:
- 07525776302
- Email:
- John@littlehero.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window