Financial history NOTTINGHAMSHIRE MINING MUSEUM LTD

Charity Number: 1183126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £21.58k £16.30k £23.47k £15.35k £23.28k
Total expenditure £14.08k £10.67k £14.09k £14.48k £17.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.80k £8.00k £1.27k £100