THE BENTLEY OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Production of operatic performances for the public both on stage and in concert form.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 August 1983: Standard registration
- THE BENTLEY (Working name)
- THE BENTLEY AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Craig | Chair | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Baillie | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pritesh Nathubhai | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELLIOT TUTT | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Galley | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE O'KEEFFE | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Galley | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.03k | £1.22k | £4.57k | £27.35k | £43.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.95k | £861 | £2.83k | £28.31k | £37.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1983 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1998 AND 8 JUNE 1999 AND 29TH MAY 2002 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAY 2018 as amended on 21 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE SAID ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 HATHAWAY ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L25 4ST
- Phone:
- 01514289923
- Email:
- info@bentleyoperatic.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window