AUTI.MS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer advice and support to autistic women & girls through regular group sessions in Bristol, and seek to improve public and professional understanding of autism in women & girls through workshops and outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 24 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gabrielle Mary Oxley | Chair | 26 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Waheeda Shaheen Hales | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Plejic | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Lorraine Gregory | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £11.86k | £2.85k | £10.76k | £5.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £858 | £4.68k | £9.66k | £4.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF FEMALES WITH AUTISM SPECTRUM CONDITION (ASC) BY IMPROVING THE UNDERSTANDING, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES, OF THE PREVALENCE AND NEEDS OF THEM AND TO RAISE AWARENESS AND PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF KNOWLEDGE TO ADVANCE OUR COLLECTIVE UNDERSTANDING OF FEMALE ASC AND HOW TO BETTER IDENTIFY THOSE EFFECTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Savoy Place
Savoy Road
Brislington
Bristol
BS4 3SX
- Phone:
- 07873 654719
- Email:
- Enquiries@auti-ms.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window