STOKE MANDEVILLE SPINAL RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to improve the lives of those suffering from spinal cord injury by giving grants to researchers to undertake projects, specifically in the areas of pressure ulcers, pain, urinary tract infections and upper limb assistive technologies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 June 2019: CIO registration
- 01 June 2020: Funds received from 1116574 STOKE MANDEVILLE SPINAL RESEARCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD TOLKIEN | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zoe McDougall | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Susan Barnett | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippe Vienot | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Polk | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Henderson | Trustee | 18 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £980.42k | £107.41k | £286.48k | £241.52k | £134.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.39k | £103.72k | £248.04k | £194.82k | £199.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £101.68k | £87.29k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £950.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £84 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £29.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £98.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £30.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND QUALITY OF LIFE OF PEOPLE WITH SPINAL CORD INJURY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY FUNDING RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT, CURE AND REHABILITATION OF SPINAL CORD INJURY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF SPINAL CORD INJURY AND ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NSIC
STOKE MANDEVILLE HOSPITAL
AYLESBURY
HP21 8AL
- Phone:
- 01296315255
- Email:
- derek.cutler@smsr.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window