NORA PARSONS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides respite to families and friends by providing day care for adults on Monday and Thursday between 10am and 3pm. Coffee, Tea, Biscuits plus a hot meal are provided for up to 20 people per day. The Day Centre provides this service for 21 local villages. The funds are built up from Donations from the Parish Councils, Fundraising and Individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 July 1983: Standard registration
- NORA PARSONS DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- NORAH PARSONS DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- WICHENFORD AND DISTRICT DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JENNIFER MARGARET WHITTAKER | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD THOMAS QUARTERMAN | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA EMILY WILKINSON | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN BROWN | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA HELEN RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.08k | £6.35k | £20.72k | £10.12k | £17.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.29k | £5.12k | £7.02k | £6.80k | £9.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1983 AS AMENDED 10 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED ON 06 JUL 1993 AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 2022 as amended on 13 Sep 2021 as amended on 25 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PERSONS AND MENTALLY ILL AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS LIVING IN THE PARISHES LISTED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS CONSTITUTION (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS AND FOR THE PROVISION OF MEALS FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED WHETHER FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 9
Heaton House
St. Peters Drive
Martley
WORCESTER
WR6 6PX
- Phone:
- 01885488976
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window