FRIENDS OF HISTON & IMPINGTON COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity seeks to improve the conditions of life of residents of all ages in the villages of Histon & Impington and its environs by: a) promoting and supporting for mental and physical wellbeing b) developing, providing and supporting opportunities and facilities for sporting, exercise and recreation c) providing and maintaining community transport services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £18,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- HI Friends (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vernon Dudley | Chair | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rob Murphy | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Camps | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Fraser | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Grafham | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rob Fisher | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Pratt | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Strivens | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Herbert Kelly | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDD STONHAM | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Cox | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Wilson | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.93k | £83.28k | £146.80k | £130.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.17k | £77.62k | £136.37k | £134.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.35k | £15.15k | £19.20k | £18.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Oct 2019 as amended on 15 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE VILLAGES OF HISTON AND IMPINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ACTIVITIES AND A COMMUNITY MINIBUS WHICH ARE CAPABLE OF REDUCING THEIR SOCIAL ISOLATION. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGES OF HISTON AND IMPINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN THE VILLAGES OF HISTON AND IMPINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS EXPERIENCING MENTAL ILLNESS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY RAISING GENERAL AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING IN THE COMMUNITY ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL HEALTH WELLBEING TO REDUCE STIGMA, DISCRIMINATION AND SOCIAL ISOLATION. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY) AND BEREAVEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 DWYER JOYCE CLOSE
HISTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 9JZ
- Phone:
- 01223232514
- Email:
- neil@hifriends.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window