Accounts and annual returns THE NELISA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1185564
Charity reporting is overdue by 1126 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
Annual return 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 395 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 395 days
Annual return 01 June 2022 22 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 761 days
Annual return 01 June 2021 22 February 2023 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1126 days
Annual return 01 June 2020 21 February 2023 691 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 23 May 2023 782 days late Download Open in new window