NORFOLK CLUBHOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Norfolk Clubhouse provides positive opportunities for those aged 18 plus into adulthood, living with unmet mental health needs to access a safe place to meet and belong as a member. Clubhouse provides opportunities to access training and to develop skills to access meaningful work, running the Clubhouse and to access Transitional Employment Placements with local employers in Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Webb | Chair | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Williams | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Cook | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Rachel Farrar | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Ulph | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Toole | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alexander Trenavin-Body | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £469 | £3.88k | £23.66k | £33.49k | £14.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £872 | £2.19k | £4.83k | £18.75k | £9.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NORFOLK SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES TO INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR VOCATIONALLY DISABLED BY MENTAL ILLNESS TO RECOVER CONFIDENCE AND DEVELOP SKILLS NECESSARY TO ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carrow House
King Street
NORWICH
NR1 2TG
- Phone:
- 07935072726
- Email:
- info@norfolk-clubhouse.org
- Website:
-
norfolk-clubhouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window