Financial history UNITED KINGDOM SOCIETY FOR EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES

Charity number: 1185098
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £23.20k £24.24k £7.60k £35.91k £35.58k
Total expenditure £13.72k £4.70k £5.47k £34.45k £34.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A