STRONGMEN CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekend Retreats and other services for bereaved men.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 2019: CIO registration
- 20 December 2024: Funds received from 1166072 DARE2EXPRESS
- STRONGMEN COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marco Franchi | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark McDonald | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Crowther | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gordon James Duff | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Pugh | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.08k | £53.25k | £182.44k | £214.92k | £211.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.97k | £58.63k | £118.14k | £166.70k | £201.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF MEN RESIDENT IN ENGLAND AND WALES SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit E Arundel Court
Park Bottom
Arundel
BN18 0AA
- Phone:
- 08009150400
- Email:
- hello@StrongMen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window