ST JAMES CHURCH PRE-SCHOOL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a preschool operating in the Wokingham Borough area. We provide childcare and education for 2 - 5 year olds following the Earley Years Foundation Stage curriculum as outlined by the DofE. We operate out of the St.James Church Centre, Southlake, Woodley. We are run by a voluntary committee and funded via the early years free entitlement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wokingham
Governance
- 10 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Joy Guze | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Iris Holmes | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Hilary Reed | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Tivey | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £59.21k | £108.72k | £137.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £34.72k | £100.05k | £110.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £53.04k | £88.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church
Kingfisher Drive
Woodley
READING
RG5 3LH
- Phone:
- 01189662568
- Email:
- jamespreschool@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window