Accounts and annual returns SMART

Charity number: 1186100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 03 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2023 01 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 01 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2022 25 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 25 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2021 25 April 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 25 April 2022 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 May 2020 22 April 2022 417 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 22 April 2022 417 days late Download Open in new window