NEW SPRINGS COMMUNITY PROJECT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NSCPG deliver community-led activities on the Springs estate in Redvales, east Bury. Regular activity groups include: Over 50s Luncheon Club, Kids Club, Reiki Group, Accessible Yoga, Gardening Group and Craft for Wellbeing. NSCPG also run ad hoc events, such as community fun days, community trips and litter picking. The activities and groups are open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,986 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
Governance
- 03 October 2019: CIO registration
- NSCPG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Agnes Lund | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie kathleen Jenkins | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Louise Taylor | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Enid Horrocks | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Evans | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Frost | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.12k | £16.79k | £20.44k | £18.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.06k | £24.38k | £27.90k | £29.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.58k | £6.02k | £7.19k | £9.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS, ON AND SURROUNDING, THE SPRINGS ESTATE IN THE REDVALES WARD OF EAST BURY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (B) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW SPRINGS COMMUNITY PROJECT GROUP
C/O SPRINGS TMC
55 DORSET DRIVE
BURY
55 Dorset Drive
BL9 9DN
- Phone:
- 01617643375
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window