HIGHER KINNERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Higher Kinnerton and surrounding districts without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: a) meetings, lectures and classes, and b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 01 May 2019: CIO registration
- 21 July 2023: Funds received from 524088 KINNERTON VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH GIBBONS | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Smith | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Anthony Swash | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dillon O'Brien | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Andrew Liddle | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Collins | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Francis Mortimer | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Elson | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL WILLIAMS MBE | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.43k | £34.14k | £22.47k | £24.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.85k | £38.37k | £19.07k | £19.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.93k | £17.00k | £2.00k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HIGHER KINNERTON AND SURROUNDIG DISTRICTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HALL
BENNETTS LANE
HIGHER KINNERTON
CHESTER
CH4 9AR
- Phone:
- 01244660777
- Email:
- dwilliams881@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window