Trustees HIGHER KINNERTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1183214

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH GIBBONS | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Smith | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Anthony Swash | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dillon O'Brien | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Andrew Liddle | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Collins | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Francis Mortimer | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Elson | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL WILLIAMS MBE | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.