THE EXETER AHLUL-BAYT COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a place of worship The provision of a community space for use by the Muslim and the wider community The advancement of religious education through the promotion of the teachings of Ahlul-Bayt The promotion of multicultural and religious harmony between Muslims and non-Muslims in order to foster mutual understanding and tolerance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 12 December 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rihana Hussaini | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anjumn Hasnein Kanani | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sajjad Hyder Rizvi | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abbas Omrani | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fayyaz Ali Memon | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.56k | £14.09k | £43.28k | £56.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.05k | £3.24k | £17.03k | £8.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN EXETER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP B) THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY SPACE FOR USE BY MUSLIMS AND THE WHOLE COMMUNITY C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION THROUGH THE TEACHING OF AHLUL-BAYT D) THE PROMOTION OF MULTICULTURAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY BETWEEN MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS IN ORDER TO FOSTER MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND TOLERANCE E) ASSISTING MUSLIMS WHO ARE IN STRAIGHTENED CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE PAYMENT OF FUNERAL EXPENSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Az-Zahra Centre
3 Chapel Road
Alphington
EXETER
EX2 8TB
- Phone:
- 01392209187
- Email:
- ahlulbaytexeter@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window