GAINFORD VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATIONAL CIO

Charity Number: 1184308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time in Gainford Village Hall and tennis courts. Arts, culture, heritage and science pursuits, amateur sport and other general charitable purposes for the inhabitants of Gainford. The village hall facilities will be used by local community groups, such as a local history group, a community choir, parent and toddler groups, & a lunch club

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £50,343
Total expenditure: £51,319

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William James Oldfield Chair 02 November 2021
GAINFORD LITERARY INSTITUTE FUND
Received: On time
Anthony Greenwood Buckley Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Paul Martin Place Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Fiona Elizabeth Divers Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Lawrence Roland Chandler Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Anthony Denis Kennan CBE Trustee 02 November 2021
GAINFORD LITERARY INSTITUTE FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £48.67k £31.01k £50.34k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £46.91k £19.04k £51.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.33k N/A £800

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 DEC 1964 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30 OCT 1995
Charitable objects
(1)THE TRUST PROPERTY SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GAINFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD(HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2)THE GAINFORD TENNIS COURTS AND ANY PROPERTY SUBSEQUENTLY ACQUIRED MAY BE HELD UPON TRUST AS A RECREATION OR SPORTS GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GAINFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Registration history
  • 03 March 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
2 High Row
Gainford
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL2 3DN
Phone:
01325 733140
Website:

No information available