BARNET MEDIEVAL FESTIVAL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history of medieval life and warfare, with a focus on the history of the town of Barnet, through the provision of a re-enactment of the Battle of Barnet 1471, and other educational activities as the trustees see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Braithwaite | Chair | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Elizabeth Best | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nevill Howard Rogers | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Last | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Avrum Vinick | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.57k | £1.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.19k | £2.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 May 2019 as amended on 01 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF MEDIEVAL LIFE AND WARFARE, WITH A FOCUS ON THE HISTORY OF THE TOWN OF BARNET, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A RE-ENACTMENT OF THE BATTLE OF BARNET 1471, AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Warwick Villa
29 Leicester Road
New Barnet
BARNET
EN5 5EW
- Phone:
- 020 8447 3992
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window