JOAN'S NORTH WALES PARROT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
North Wales Parrot Rescue is a non-profitable rescue. We are a self funded rescue and do our own fundraising in and around the North Wales area. Our ethos is to educate about the care and welfare of these animals and we provide this information and support through store visits, displays, school visits, social media and as well guest talks
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 07 February 2020: CIO registration
- JOAN'S PARROT RESCUE NW (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA JOAN RAKHRA | Chair | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bull | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MANDEEP RAKHRA | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.87k | £31.78k | £27.90k | £23.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.81k | £25.12k | £29.19k | £30.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.00k | £2.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS BIRDS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR BIRDS, IN PARTICULAR PARROTS AND PARAKEETS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION FOR REASON OF SICKNESS, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO BIRD WELFARE IN GENERAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 MOSTYN AVENUE
LLANDUDNO
LL30 1YS
- Phone:
- 07791016163
- Email:
- joan9458@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window