FRIENDS OF THE DYSLEXIA INSTITUTE (HULL)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends raises awareness of dyslexia and dyscalculia & provides information and support for people who experience difficulties and their families. As Specialist support for dyslexic people is not government-funded, fundraising is an import part of Friends' activities. This provides help towards assessments, tuition and equipment at the local dyslexia centres in Hull, Bridlington and Scarborough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 July 1983: Standard registration
- 25 January 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1168674 DYSLEXIA SPARKS
- NORTH HUMBERSIDE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.68k | £2.66k | £8.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.74k | £8.55k | £34.03k | £12.32k | £10.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 19 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEBRUARY 1983 AS AMENDED 12 MAY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS HANDICAPPED BY DYSLEXIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window