ENDURING NET (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote human rights (as set out in the 1948 Universal Declaration of Human Rights and subsequent United Nations conventions and declarations), in particular but not exclusively to eradicate forced and child labour, end modern slavery and human trafficking by introducing distributed technology, AI, identity and privacy in humanitrarian work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- United States
Governance
- 13 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ser Huang Poon | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Gorman | Trustee | 16 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Wei Min Lim | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 May 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 04 April 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
1.) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE 1948 UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ERADICATE FORCED AND CHILD LABOUR, END MODERN SLAVERY AND HUMAN TRAFFICKING, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY FACILITATING AND ASSISTING IN THE FOLLOWING: • MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; • OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; • ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS; • RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; • PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENTS AND OTHERS. 2.) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF HOMELESSNESS AND OF THE DISAPPEARANCE OF PERSONS WITHOUT TRACE (MISSING PERSONS) BY ASSISTING IN MEETING SUCH NEEDS AND LOCATING SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment RM 308
Royal Mills
2 Cotton Street
MANCHESTER
M4 5BZ
- Phone:
- +447831362346
- Email:
- enduringnet@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window