LILY'S CHIHUAHUA RESCUE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A non profit charity for Dog rescue
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Taylor | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
THERESA BROWN | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.51k | £44.26k | £15.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.54k | £31.90k | £15.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Long Meadow
North Church Common
Berkhamsted
HP4 1LR
- Phone:
- 07740305987
- Email:
- lilychirescue@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window