THE TREMORE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in such ways and in such parts of the UK or world as trustees think fit. We provide premises in Cornwall for Christians and those enquiring after the Christian faith to meet together for sharing beliefs, working with other Christian ministries. We are preparing a residential property as a place of "refuge, retreat and healing".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Philippines
Governance
- 02 June 2020: CIO registration
- 19 November 2021: Funds received from 282966 THE TREMORE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lyndon Armstrong Rust | Chair | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Macleod | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIE CHESTERTON BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Emily Rust | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA TAYLOR | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PERNET | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET TRUE | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.51k | £189.76k | £17.63k | £39.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.14k | £156.36k | £38.81k | £42.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ACCORDING TO THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE, IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tremore Manor
Lanivet
BODMIN
Cornwall
PL30 5JT
- Phone:
- 01208831204
- Email:
- suepernet@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window