Accounts and annual returns LITTLE MOONS BILINGUAL PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1182941
Charity reporting is up to date (111 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 27 May 2025 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 27 May 2025 111 days late
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 November 2024 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 11 November 2024 280 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 October 2023 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 27 October 2023 264 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 31 March 2022 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 31 March 2022 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 February 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window