Financial history LITTLE MOONS BILINGUAL PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1182941
Charity reporting is up to date (111 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.17k £22.91k £32.34k £37.94k £29.65k
Total expenditure £20.17k £22.91k £32.34k £37.94k £29.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.16k £1.74k £0
Income from government grants £18.00k £10.00k £2.00k N/A £1.76k