THORNER VICTORY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Village Hall facilities to the Thorner community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 10 June 2019: CIO registration
- 29 July 2020: Funds received from 1021891 THORNER VICTORY HALL AND INSTITUTE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Peter Schofield | Chair | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Waterland | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jon David Lacey | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Oldfield | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Stainthorpe | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lynne Lacey | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Wilson | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Westwood Brear | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSALYN ANN RAMSEY | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Noble | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOYRA PLAYER | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.36k | £35.12k | £13.54k | £34.16k | £41.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.15k | £66.04k | £42.51k | £46.39k | £34.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2021 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2021 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO MAINTAIN AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL PRIMARILY ( BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF THORNER (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victory Hall
Carr Lane
Thorner
LEEDS
LS14 3EY
- Phone:
- 07368318891
- Email:
- thevictoryhall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window